Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, Wilmington Trust Na As Truste, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lanning, Peter Earl, Zahm, Douglas Clark, against Christian, Paul K, Messier, Donna, United States Of America Depar, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRASINGTON, MONICA J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 20, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO SAHARA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 11019 | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO SAHARA PROPERTY MGT | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET 7/23/2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.