Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Something New Catering Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Walker, Stuart Scott, against Idt Sfx Tomorrowworld Llc, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRASINGTON, MONICA J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Updated Event NONJURY TRIAL on 7/27/2016 0900 AM Judge MONICA BRASINGTON results CANCELLED on 6/10/2016 | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Updated Event PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on 7/15/2016 1030 AM Judge MONICA BRASINGTON results CANCELLED on 6/10/2016 | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS (PTC FOR 7-15-2016 AND JURY TRIAL FOR 7-27-2016 CANCELLED) | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT ID&T/SFX TOMORROWWORLD, LLC | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM FROM 12-18-2015 | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Event NONJURY TRIAL scheduled on 7/27/2016 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MONICA BRASINGTON presiding. | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Event PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 7/15/2016 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge MONICA BRASINGTON presiding. | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Updated Event NONJURY TRIAL on 3/31/2016 0900 AM Judge MONICA BRASINGTON results CONTINUED on 7/27/2016 | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Updated Event PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on 3/22/2016 0830 AM Judge MONICA BRASINGTON results CONTINUED on 7/15/2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.