Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Orr, Georgette, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against The Florida Department Of Corr, represented by Green, Edwin Ames, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2014 |
CategoryOther-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF THE CLERK | |
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE | |
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NO OBJECTION | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR DFNDT | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT BUCHANAN FOR DFNDT | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO LEON COUNTY | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON MICHAEL CRUZ 7/18/14 | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.