Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Slaman, Amy P, against Harveson, Melissa, Harveson, Pamela, Unknown Spouse Of Lori Shepard, Unknown Spouse Of Melissa Harv, Unknown Spouse Of Pamela Harve, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with William E. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam E. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2012 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Homestead Resid $0-50,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FROM ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLP OF REFUND CKECK. REFUND CHECK SENT BACK OUT ON 12-22-2014 | |
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event | COPY OF REFUND CHECK SENT TO ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLP FOR $10.00 | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 3159 | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA G SHEPARD | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 2602 | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.