Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Campus Usa Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ricke, Jeff J, against Warriner, Joy M, Warriner, Shawn M, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 08, 2012 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON SHAWN WARRINER 11/17/12 | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JOY WARRINER 11/17/12 | |
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event | ELECTRONICALLY FILED SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER | |
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER | |
October 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
October 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00 | |
October 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.