Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kisielewski, Susan A, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Curtis, Ryan Colby, against Johnson, Sidney L, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Ysleta W. McDonald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYsleta W. McDonald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2012 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Oth Real Prop Actn $0-50,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WRIT OF POSSESSION ON SIDNEY JOHNSON 1/19/13 | |
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED WRIT OF POSSESSION ON SIDNEY JOHNSON | |
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession to correct address | |
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EJECTMENT - to correct address | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Active Process WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EJECTMENT | |
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING DATE FOR NON JURY TRIAL 12/4/12 @9:30AM | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Event NONJURY TRIAL scheduled on 12/4/2012 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge YSLETA MCDONALD presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.