Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Padgett, Timothy Daniel, against Douglas, Jonathan M, Douglas, Teresa J, Unknown Tenant, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Ysleta W. McDonald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYsleta W. McDonald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2012 |
CategoryReplevin |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, HEARING ON 7/11/2012 @10:40AM | |
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 7/11/2012 at 1040 AM, MX - Judge YSLETA MCDONALD presiding. | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN TENANT | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FOR TERESA DOUGLAS | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FOR JONATHAN DOUGLAS | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Payment received: $515.00 Receipt Number MX 204 | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.