Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dewees, Virginia, Dewees, Jerrel, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Graham, Mark, represented by Smith, Benjamin Larry, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Ysleta W. McDonald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYsleta W. McDonald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2012 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR PLNTF | |
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 7/11/13 @10:30AM | |
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FROM PLNTF | |
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FROM JOHN HAYTER | |
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONF 7/11/13 @10:30AM | |
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Event STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled on 7/11/2013 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge YSLETA MCDONALD presiding. | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER & AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FROM MARK GRAHAM | |
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO CANCEL HEARING & ALLOW PLEADING AMENDMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.