Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Assc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Scott, Barbara M, Unknown Tenant #1, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with MCDONALD, YSLETA WHITEHEAD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCDONALD, YSLETA WHITEHEAD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: January 17, 2013NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: August 13, 2012SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: August 13, 2012FAX TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE 7/15/13
Date: July 09, 2013CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 13, 2012ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: August 14, 2012NOTICE OF HEARING 3/11/13 @9:30AM
Date: February 04, 2013RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: September 07, 2012FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 12, 2013MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: January 17, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2012NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES
Date: January 17, 2013VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM $71624.27
Date: August 13, 2012AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2013HEARING FORM 3-11-13
Date: March 12, 2013RESPONSE FROM BARBARA SCOTT
Date: September 13, 2012MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: August 13, 2012RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JEREMIAH BROCHEY 8/17/12
Date: September 07, 2012SUMMONS FOR BARBARA M SCOTT
Date: August 13, 2012RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON BARBARA SCOTT 8/17/12
Date: September 07, 2012REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE, FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: March 12, 2013FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: March 12, 2013MOTION FOR DEFAULT ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: January 17, 2013ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE & SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONF 3/11/13 @9:30AM
Date: February 01, 2013NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE (7/15/13)
Date: March 12, 2013DEFAULT ON UNK TENANT 1
Date: January 17, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT, DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS & RETURNING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE TO POPKIN & ROSALER PA | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE TO POPKIN & ROSALER PA | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT, DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS & RETURNING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT, DISMISS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISHCARGE LIS PENDENS & RETURN ORIGINAL DOCS | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number MX 1907 | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT, DISMISS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISHCARGE LIS PENDENS & RETURN ORIGINAL DOCS | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.