Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Klotzman, Scott Eric, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Klotzman, Scott Eric, against Fednat Insurance Company, represented by Klotzman, Scott Eric, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint was filed by Martin Shugart and Renee Shugart against Fednat Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the 7th Judicial Circuit in Flagler County, Florida. The plaintiffs are seeking damages exceeding $30,000, exclusive of interest, co...
NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: April 12, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: April 12, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DISCOVERY RESPONSES | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.