Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Para, Jeffrey James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Richardson, Dawna, Smith, Betty, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed by Jeffrey Para against defendants Dawna Richardson and Betty Smith in the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit in Flagler County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on October 21, 2018, while Para was traveling on ...
COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- BETTY SMITH
Date: November 12, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: November 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE PROCESS | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2021018100 | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS PREPARED- BETTY SMITH | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS PREPARED- DAWNA RICHARDSON | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAITNIFS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021005877 | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE OTHER ASSESSED $400.00 | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.