Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gorfinkel, Mikhail, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Tomlinson, Brandon Joel, against Family Security Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: April 09, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS PREPARED- FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.