Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Blair, Connie, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Guppenberger, Brian C, against 3001 Palm Coast Parkway Operations Llc, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Negligence Nursing Home |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
This complaint is a legal action filed by Connie Blair, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Bobby Blair, against 3001 Palm Coast Parkway Operations LLC, doing business as Grand Oaks Health and Rehabilitation Center. The complaint alleges ...
COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- GRAND OAKS HEALTH AND REHAB CENTER
Date: March 29, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: June 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021005157 | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE OTHER ASSESSED $400.00 | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEES (SUMMONS) ASSESSED $10.00 | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS PREPARED- GRAND OAKS HEALTH AND REHAB CENTER | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.