Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dcm Services C O Verizon Wireless, Walters, Amanda P, Walters, Shane M, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Boles, W. Joel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBoles, W. Joel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryProbate - Formal |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CLOSE ESTATE | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION TO EXTEND TIME TO CLOSE ESTATE | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING - CLOSING OF ESTATE | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER WAIVING REQUIREMENT OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS & FILING OF STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING FINAL ACCOUNTING PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND CLOSING THE ESTATE 02/022/2023 | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 02/22/2022 AT 11:00 AM IN / , JDG: BOLES, W. JOEL | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 2/22/2022 @ 12:00 PM ET (11:00 PM CST) | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING - STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS AND POP | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO CLAIM MADE BY DCM ON BEHALF OF VERIZON WIRELESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.