Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Davis, Gordon R filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with [ U ] BOLES, W JOEL presiding.
Case Number |
Judge[ U ] BOLES, W JOEL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryProbate - Formal |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.8652.268 / 2021119832) | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCT PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST FOR CLOSING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF DISTRIBUTION - MARK R DAVIS | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | INVENTORY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.