Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Palmetto Surety Corporation, Savage, Lakeisha Joyce, Skipper, Jody C, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with NOBLES, LINDA L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNOBLES, LINDA L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryBond Estreature |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
BOND FORFEITURE (PSE229835)
Date: January 14, 2021ORDER ON MOVANT'S "APPLICATION FOR SET ASIDE OF BOND JUDGMENT"
Date: January 25, 2021APPLICATION FOR SET ASIDE OF BOND JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2021PAYMENT $17.00 RECEIPT #2021003602
Date: January 15, 2021PAYMENT $1,000.00 RECEIPT #2021003458
Date: January 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.8471.1531 / 2021020457) | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOVANT'S "APPLICATION FOR SET ASIDE OF BOND JUDGMENT" - Recorded (OR.8451.993 / 2021008569) | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOVANT'S "APPLICATION FOR SET ASIDE OF BOND JUDGMENT" | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ESCAMBIA COUNTY CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT AND COMPTROLLER'S RESPONSE TO BAIL BOND AGENT'S APPLICATION FOR SET A SIDE OF BOND JUDGMENT | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR SET ASIDE OF BOND JUDGMENT | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $17.00 RECEIPT #2021003602 | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ON BOND FORFEITURE - Recorded (OR.8444.1442 / 2021005097) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | BOND FORFEITURE (PSE229835) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,000.00 RECEIPT #2021003458 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.