Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Td Bank Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Wolfe, David Andrew, against Lyons, John, represented by Johnson, Christopher R, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Nobles, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNobles, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2020 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by TD Bank, N.A. against John Lyons in the Circuit Court of the 1st Judicial Circuit in Escambia County, Florida. The complaint alleges that John Lyons, as a member of Mountain and Vale Realty, LLC, executed a Promissory Note ...
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: December 01, 2020AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT (AS TO CASE NUMBER)
Date: January 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT (AS TO CASE NUMBER) - Recorded (OR.8923.542 / 2023007363) | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT (AS TO CASE NUMBER) | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING TD BANK NA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF $59,192.42 - Recorded (OR.8910.104 / 2022122329) | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING TD BANK NA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF $59,192.42 | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN ON ACTIVE COURT DOCKET | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING DECEMBER 6, 2022 | |
September 05, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.