Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shan Kishi Japanese Hibachi Llc, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Geisler, Ephraim Samuel, against Eisman & Russo Inc, Skanska Usa Civil Inc, Skanska Usa Civil Southeast Inc, represented by Branning, Jeremy C, Remington, Scott A, Strayhan, Harvey Lee Iii, Tribuch, Kenneth H, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with DANNHEISSER, THOMAS . presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDANNHEISSER, THOMAS . Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryMass Tort |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
This complaint is filed by Shan Kishi Japanese Hibachi, LLC against Skanska USA Civil Southeast, Inc. and Eisman & Russo, Inc. The plaintiff alleges that the defendants' negligence in failing to remove or secure their work platforms prior to Hurrican...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE SKANSKA'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING FINAL RESOLUTION OF CONCURRENT FEDERAL ACTION | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS ANSER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, EISMAN & RUSSO, INC., ONLY | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORDERS APPROVING VALUATION, SECURITY, NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS AND MANNER OF PUBLICATION, AND ENJOINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS ENTERED BY THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC'S NOTICE OF ITS LIMITATION OF LIABILTY ACTION IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA AND REQUEST TO STAY ALL ACTIONS AND PROCEEDINGS | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE BY DEFENDANT SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC OF ITS FILING OF COMPLAINTS FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABLITY IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA AND CESSATION OF ALL CLAIMS AND PROCEEDINGS | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: BRANNING, JEREMY C ASSIGNED | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WAIVER AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION FOR DEFENDANT SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST, INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.