Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tyeshia Cox-Hardy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hanna, Amy Maletzky, Peetluk, Ellis W, Salisbury, David Arthur, against Kevin Henry, P&S Transportation, Inc., represented by Vickers, Heath L, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FELTEL JR, GILBERT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFELTEL JR, GILBERT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Negligence Case Division: Cv-H |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by TYESHIA COX-HARDY against P&S TRANSPORTATION, INC. and KEVIN HENRY in the Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit in Duval County, Florida. The complaint alleges personal injury resulting from a tractor-trailer collisi...
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (JOINT) WITH PREJUDICE
Date: April 12, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLAINTIFF'S)
Date: February 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSED | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CANCELLED JURY TRIAL ON 6/5/2023 9:30:00 AM | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (JOINT) WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT P&S TRANSPORTATION, INC'S SECOND) TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFENDANTS P AND S TRANSPORTATION INC AND KEVIN HENRYS) TO PLAINTIFF TYESHIA COX-HARDY | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT - IMPASSE | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE (DEFENDANTS') OF APPEARANCE AT MEDIATOIN AND CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 3/3/23 AT 2PM VIA ZOOM | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL; AMENDING CERTAIN TRIAL ORDER DEADLINES AND JURISTICTIONAL ALLEGATION BY CONSENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.