Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kristen Brady, Kyle Brady, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Graham, David Mitchell, Luering, Ryan John, against First Protective Insurance Company D B A Frontline Insurance, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with Anderson Jr, Bruce R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderson Jr, Bruce R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Claims Division: Cv-E |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDNAT, FIRST PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFFS | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF KRISTEN BRADY | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF KYLE BRADY | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Plan | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | SECOND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFT FIRST PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANYS) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.