Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fernandez, Karen Elizabeth, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Fernandez Lopez, Jose Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Manalich, Ramiro presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeManalich, Ramiro Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryDor Administrative Support Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Kirshy, Russell Thomas | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Manalich, Ramiro | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Action Request | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal/Termination of Administrative Support Proceeding | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Unified Family Court Reassignment to McGowan, John O | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DOR Administrative Support Order | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Action Request | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Proceeding to Establish Administrative Order | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DOR Demographic Information Sheet | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Social Security Number for Petitioner and Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.