Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Aviles Rosado, Adan Hommy, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with FORBESS, RAYMOND EDWARD Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFORBESS, RAYMOND EDWARD Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - PERDUE BRANDON | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | RECALL CASE FROM COLLECTIONS - MSB | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - MSB COLLECTION AGENCY | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 07/13/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $137.00 | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ACXLRBE | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 04/13/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR008178 | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.