Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Warren, Lauren Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: April 09, 2021D6 CLEARED
Date: August 03, 2021PAYMENT $134.00 RECEIPT #100422
Date: August 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $134.00 RECEIPT #100422 | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ACXLQYE | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACXLQYE | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 07/09/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $134.00 | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ACXLQYE | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 04/12/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR008103 | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.