Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Bond, Sean, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $501-$2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #84041
Date: April 12, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 4/13/2023 1:26 PM / RECEPTION #: 2023017613 | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED INDV SRVD 5/15/21 | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - DEFENDANT FTA | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM ON 7/21/2021 @ 11:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.