Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Evans, Weston Troy, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: April 09, 2021ORDER OF BOND
Date: April 10, 2021PAYMENT $360.00 RECEIPT #170675
Date: December 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $360.00 RECEIPT #170675 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AE58SBE | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AE58SBE | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $901.00 RECEIPT #168592 | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AE58SBE | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AE58SBE | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AE58SBE | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AE58SBE | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - VOP | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR COSTS PLUS INTEREST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.