Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Strong, Christina Renee, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER OF BOND
Date: April 12, 2021PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #176914
Date: February 02, 2023PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #176915
Date: February 02, 2023ORDER TERMINATING PROBATION
Date: January 19, 2023PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #201077
Date: June 30, 2023PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #196217
Date: June 01, 2023PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #186395
Date: March 28, 2023PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #190201
Date: April 24, 2023ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION
Date: January 05, 2023RECEIPT # 173527 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00
Date: January 12, 2023PAYMENT $16.65 RECEIPT #163803
Date: November 01, 2022PAYMENT $20.48 RECEIPT #159159
Date: September 29, 2022PAYMENT $43.27 RECEIPT #166154
Date: November 18, 2022PAYMENT $38.46 RECEIPT #140801
Date: May 27, 2022PAYMENT $482.76 RECEIPT #173529
Date: January 12, 2023PAYMENT $101.56 RECEIPT #173527
Date: January 12, 2023PAYMENT $16.67 RECEIPT #146349
Date: July 06, 2022RECEIPT # 137874 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00
Date: May 05, 2022PAYMENT $16.67 RECEIPT #167805
Date: December 01, 2022PAYMENT $16.67 RECEIPT #154760
Date: August 30, 2022PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #137874
Date: May 05, 2022PAYMENT $16.67 RECEIPT #137240
Date: May 02, 2022PLEA
Date: September 28, 2021PAYMENT $22.78 RECEIPT #141576
Date: June 02, 2022PAYMENT $38.46 RECEIPT #137889
Date: May 05, 2022PAYMENT $38.46 RECEIPT #131835
Date: March 23, 2022PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #123826
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION
Date: April 19, 2021ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT
Date: April 12, 2021INFORMATION FILED
Date: April 16, 2021FLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION
Date: April 12, 2021JUDGMENT & SENTENCE - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 10/18/2021 12:48 PM / RECEPTION #: 2021065791
Date: October 12, 2021JAIL MEMORANDUM
Date: October 12, 2021ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT- SIGNATURE
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #201077 | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #196217 | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #190201 | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #186395 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #176914 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #176915 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TERMINATING PROBATION | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT IN COURT | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 173527 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.