Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Reverse Mortgage Funding Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Chin-Duncan, Karissa, against Bentley Properties Inc, Berendes Kathryn Clark, Berendes Robert Dale, Kathryn Clark Berendes, Kathryn Clark Berendes, As Ben, (total of 14) See All represented by Thompson, James Crit, in the jurisdiction of Calhoun County, FL, . Calhoun County, FL Superior Courts with GROVER, JAMES KEVIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROVER, JAMES KEVIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Nonhomestead Resd $250,000-More |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCalhoun County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC against Robert Dale Berendes, as trustee of the Robert Dale Berendes Family Trust, and Kathryn Clark Berendes, as trustee for the Kathryn Clark Berendes Family Trust. The pl...
RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: January 13, 2020Notice of Confidential Information
Date: December 11, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: March 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE-PLAINTIFF $100.00 | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE 3/10/2022 11AM CST-MAILED TO THE COUNTY RECORD | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE-MAILED TO THE COUNTY RECORD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.