Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Finlen, Erin F filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Gillespie, Kenneth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGillespie, Kenneth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryPurported Will |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Discharge Signed: 09/09/2021 Judge Gillespie |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement Re: Creditors Pub Date: 4/29/21 |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Mandated Checklist - Pet for Discharge | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due Signed By - Virginia M. Haslett ; Executed On 8/5/21 |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiv Acctg & Port Pet for Disch, Waiv Srvc, Rcpt Benf & Con Virginia M. Haslett |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Discharge Final (No Propose Order) |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction & Release Claim Remedi Senior Care - TPA |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction & Release Claim Remedi Seniorcare-TPA |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction & Release Claim Holy Cross Hospital Medical Group |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Claim Mailed By Clerk REMEDI SENIORCARE-TPA - Mailed by clerk 07/01/21 jtAmount: $3,497.83 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.