Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sheehan, Karen, Sheehan, Thomas, Iii, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Rosenbaum, Daniel, against Fednat Insurance Company, represented by West, Lindsay Marie, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Michael A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Thomas Sheehan III and Karen Sheehan against FedNat Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they had a property insurance policy with the defendant for their property located at 11626 NW 48th Court, Coral Springs, Flo...
Request for Production
Date: February 23, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: March 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement AND REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM HEARING DOCKETParty: Plaintiff Sheehan, Karen Plaintiff Sheehan, Thomas, III |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Fednat Insurance Company |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Fednat Insurance Company |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Party: Plaintiff Sheehan, Karen Plaintiff Sheehan, Thomas, III |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Party: Plaintiff Sheehan, Thomas, III Plaintiff Sheehan, Karen |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO none |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Sheehan, Thomas Plaintiff Sheehan, Karen |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Fednat Insurance Company |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Sheehan, Thomas Plaintiff Sheehan, Karen |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGESParty: Plaintiff Sheehan, Thomas Plaintiff Sheehan, Karen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.