Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Espinosa, Miguel, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Elazar, Sapir, Lieb, Lora Adele, against United Services Automobile Association, represented by Acosta, Julio Cesar, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevenson, Jeffrey R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
eSummons Issuance
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Espinosa, Miguel |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFENDANT'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Defendant United Services Automobile Association |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Espinosa, Miguel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.