Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Prince, Marc, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Bilu, Ron S., against Taub, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Olefson, Shari Africk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOlefson, Shari Africk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Marc Prince against Jennifer Taub in the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint alleges that the plaintiff and defendant entered into a joint business venture in 2019, wi...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: February 23, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: July 01, 2021Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: July 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Final Judgment AMENDEDParty: Plaintiff Prince, Marc |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit OF INDEBTENESS AND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S, MARC PRINCE, AMENDED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff Prince, Marc |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit FEESParty: Plaintiff Prince, Marc |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTSParty: Plaintiff Prince, Marc |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Prince, Marc |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF DROPPING COUNT III OF COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Prince, Marc |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order CMC: 10-04-2021 8:45 AM |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Default againstParty: Defendant Taub, Jennifer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.