Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Marcien, Cleome, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Paillere, Ruben, against Gambetta, Luis, represented by Ryan, Anne M, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBidwill, Martin J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: May 24, 2022Order Setting
Date: May 21, 2022Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSAL OF SETTLEMENTParty: Defendant Gambetta, Luis |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Interrogatories & Notice of Service | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
May 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Setting | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Answers to Expert Interrogatories |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List SECOND AMENDEDParty: Defendant Gambetta, Luis |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List SECOND AMENDEDParty: Defendant Gambetta, Luis |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Objection TO PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL EXHIBITSParty: Defendant Gambetta, Luis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.