Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Amador, Carla, Amador, Samuel, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Duboff, Kenneth, against Safepoint Insurance Company, represented by Bakas, Marta K, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevenson, Jeffrey R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 23, 2021Request for Production
Date: February 23, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: February 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Amador, Samuel |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial January 24, 2022 at 10am |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time to RESPONDParty: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.