Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Harden, Jacory L, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Pro Se, against State Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Michael A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: February 23, 2021Complaint
Date: February 23, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: February 23, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: April 01, 2021Motion
Date: April 09, 2021Notice
Date: April 14, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: January 07, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served Alconero c/o Alconero & Associates LLC |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Party: Plaintiff Harden, Jacory L |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Resolve The Case Or Narrow Issues/UnsignedParty: Plaintiff Harden, Jacory L |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved on The State of Florida Department of Corrections |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Issued To The State of Florida Department of Corrections |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued To The State of Florida/HB to Plaintiff |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.