Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ventura, Maria, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Kuhn, Clayton Tyler, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Qiu, Mengjun "Kristy", in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevenson, Jeffrey R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Request for Admissions
Date: February 23, 2021Request to Produce
Date: February 23, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: February 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Ventura, Maria |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Ventura, Maria |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.