Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Grenadier Gardens Association, Inc., filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Lopez, Carlos F, against Weirs, David D, represented by Haynes, Benjamine C, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSinger, Michele Towbin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryCondominium Action |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: February 23, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: April 09, 2021Notice of Service
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Disbursing Funds | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Disbursement FOR SURPLUS FUNDSParty: Defendant Weirs, David D |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Weirs, David D |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Emailed | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Emailed | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.