Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Goncalves, Ricardo, Monasterio, Carla, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Martin, Jamie R, against Zortam, Llc,, represented by Pozo, Jaime A., Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Request to Produce
Date: February 23, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: February 23, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: February 23, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: March 17, 2021Affidavit of Service
Date: March 05, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 17, 2021Request for Production
Date: March 30, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 30, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: May 02, 2021Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 13, 2021Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: October 06, 2021Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: November 17, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: October 13, 2021Certificate
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Interrogatories
Date: March 30, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 30, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 27, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 30, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 07, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 03, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: May 04, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 04, 2021Notice of Withdrawal
Date: May 17, 2021Privilege Log
Date: May 21, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: May 21, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 21, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 07, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 13, 2021Privilege Log
Date: July 08, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 11, 2021Mediation Report
Date: December 08, 2021Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: July 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF MEDIATION AUTHORITYParty: Defendant Zortam, LLC, |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) Party: Plaintiff Goncalves, Ricardo |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Response - Request for Production TO DEFENDANT'SParty: Plaintiff Goncalves, Ricardo |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.