Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lopez Melissa, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Harrack Neesha, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with DAVID E. SILVERMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID E. SILVERMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Event Code 6303-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33643130
Date: June 09, 2021SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED Event Code 7652-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33378479
Date: April 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | CR: MEDIATION HEARD Event Code 4420-Event Seq 3 | ||
June 09, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 4 | ||
June 09, 2021 | JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Event Code 6303-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33643130 | ||
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Event Code 3932-Event Seq 1 | |
April 27, 2021 | NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION Event Code 5740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33396398 | ||
April 21, 2021 | SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED Event Code 7652-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33378479 | ||
April 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION Event Code 5740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33298472 | ||
March 31, 2021 | SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED Event Code 7650-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 33251870 | ||
March 31, 2021 | ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 5 | ||
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2721-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33248293 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.