Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Glass Annette Elizabeth, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Verizon Wireless Services Llc, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with KELLY INGRAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY INGRAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33482493
Date: May 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2021 | FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5620-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33774788 | ||
July 28, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | ||
July 27, 2021 | CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONDUCTED Event Code 4394-Event Seq 2 | ||
July 27, 2021 | CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1 | ||
July 05, 2021 | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | ||
June 28, 2021 | MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT NO AGREEMENT OR IMPASSE Event Code 11098-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33644365 | ||
May 24, 2021 | ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33482493 | ||
May 14, 2021 | NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION Event Code 5740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33434862 | ||
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Event Code 3932-Event Seq 1 | |
May 12, 2021 | CR: PRETRIAL CONF CONDUCTED Event Code 4198-Event Seq 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.