Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Roehrich Kathleen, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Tammaro Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with DAVID E. SILVERMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAVID E. SILVERMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS Event Code 5125-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33298229
Date: April 12, 2021MOTION TO EXPEDITE Event Code 10029-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33337017
Date: April 13, 2021CORRESPONDENCE Event Code 7843-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 33298258
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | CHANGE ADDRESS PHONE/COUNTER Event Code 7993-Event Seq 2 | ||
May 03, 2021 | CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 3 | ||
May 03, 2021 | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 | ||
April 29, 2021 | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE Event Code 10256-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33387062 | ||
April 29, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2 | ||
April 15, 2021 | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6866-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33340589 | ||
April 13, 2021 | MOTION TO EXPEDITE Event Code 10029-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33337017 | ||
April 13, 2021 | F/J FWD TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW Event Code 10635-Event Seq 1 | ||
April 12, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS Event Code 5125-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33298229 | ||
April 12, 2021 | CORRESPONDENCE Event Code 7843-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 33298258 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.