Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Daj Properties Llc, Lopez Ana, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Scruggs Charles M, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with JUDITH E ATKIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDITH E ATKIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
ORDER SETTING HEARING Event Code 3486-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33385447
Date: May 03, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33387043
Date: April 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6209-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33518816 | ||
May 28, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | ||
May 27, 2021 | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 | ||
May 27, 2021 | CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2 | ||
May 13, 2021 | CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2 | ||
May 13, 2021 | CAL:EVICTION HEARING Event Code 3954-Event Seq 1 | ||
May 03, 2021 | ORDER SETTING HEARING Event Code 3486-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33385447 | ||
April 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33387043 | ||
April 07, 2021 | F/J FWD TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW Event Code 10635-Event Seq 1 | ||
April 06, 2021 | RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33270829 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.