Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Young, Willie Jay, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Inch, Mark S, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS
Date: December 30, 2019LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE
Date: December 31, 2019RECEIPT FROM ST LUCIE COUNTY
Date: January 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT SIGNED | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FROM ST LUCIE COUNTY | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | FILE MAILED TO ST LUCIE COUNTY | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER TRANSFERRING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Agency Case Number: DOC | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 042019CA000677CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/30/2019 | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: KREIDER , DAVID P assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.