Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
121 Financial Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Reiss, Jennifer L, against Reed, Cassandra Lacheryl, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 20, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: HIDAY & RICKE
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IN WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT IN WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSE | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VYSTAR CREDIT UNION | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION JOINT MOTION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLF'S AGENT ANSWERING AFFIDAVIT OF EXEMPTION | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY AND OTHER PROPERTY | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CLAIM OF EXEMPTION & REQUEST FOR HEARING CASSANDRA REED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.