Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Olin, Glenn C, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Dukes, Matthew Aaron, against Mcclellan, Jennifer, Mcclellan, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
|
SUMMONS
Date: December 13, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 13, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED THOMAS MCCLELLAN
Date: December 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/EXHIBITS FILED BY DEFENDANT | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING (REMOTE) ON 6/16/20 @ 1:30PM | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR 4-13-20 | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 4/13/2020 0330 PM Judge DAVID KREIDER results Cancelled on 4/13/2020 | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing AMENDED 6-16-20 @ 1:30 PM | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 6/16/2020 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge DAVID KREIDER presiding. | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/13/2020 at 0330 PM, MX - Judge DAVID KREIDER presiding. | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.