Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Decelle, Carole, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Ciesla, Larry Edward, Lester, Jennifer Cates, against Miller, Michael L Ii, represented by Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: September 25, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: September 11, 2020REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: September 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number M 13460499 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE BID SHEET | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO PLAINTIFF FOR $500.00 | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing PROOF OF PUBLICATION 12/16/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.