Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Brown, William Roger, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Florida Commission On Offender, Inch, Mark S, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
RECEIPT FOR FILE
Date: November 21, 2019ORDER DIRECTING FLORIDA COMMISSION ON OFFENDER REVIEW TO RESPOND
Date: November 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO PLAINTIFF | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM WILLIAM BROWN TO CLERK | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO PLAINTIFF SENT WITH REQUESTED COPIES | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF TO CLERK | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | BY ORDER OF THE COURT: DCA DISMISSED | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO WILLIAM BROWN | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM WILLIAM BROWN TO CLERK | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO PLAINTIFF | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF TO CLERK | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.