Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Clay, Octavian Rodrigo, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Mcneill, Kevin Anthony, against Walmart Stores East Lp, represented by Morales, Michele Denise, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 04, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2019SUMMONS
Date: October 04, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: October 10, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF WALMART STORES EAST LP
Date: January 15, 2020REQUEST FIRST REQUES TO PRODUCE TO DEF WALMART STORES EAST LP
Date: January 15, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: April 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M Assigned | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE REASSIGNED | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY MORALES AND NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN THE SAME FIRM | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF PAPER DISCOVERY TO DEF WALMART STORES LP | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF WALMART STORES EAST LP | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FIRST REQUES TO PRODUCE TO DEF WALMART STORES EAST LP | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY AND AVOIDANCE TO DEF'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.