Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Delvalle, Carlos, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Secretary Of Florida Dept Of C, in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with KREIDER, DAVID PHILIP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKREIDER, DAVID PHILIP Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF FILE
Date: September 05, 2019ORDER TRANSFERRING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Date: September 05, 2019LETTER FROM CARLOS DELVALLE
Date: September 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO AMEND AND REHEARING | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF TRANSFERRED CASE | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Agency Case Number: DOC | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: KREIDER , DAVID P assigned | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 042019CA000465CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/5/2019 | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF FILE | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CARLOS DELVALLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.