Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cook, Deborah, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Howell, Theodore Randolph, against Biomat Usa Inc, represented by Hodges, Lucian Brown, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENRY, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint was filed by Deborah Cook against Biomat USA, Inc. in the Circuit Court of the First Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Biomat USA, Inc. and seeks damages in excess of $15,000. Debo...
EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: February 03, 2021EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 28, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE HENRY, WILLIAM: ASSIGNED | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION K ASSIGNED | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION | |
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY 03/22/2021 @ 9:00 A.M.; AND PRETRIAL 03/01/2021 @ 9:30 A.M. | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.