Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Schafer, William B, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bradley, Brent F., against Fontainebleau Terrace Owners Association Inc, represented by Rogers, Randall G, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by William B. Schafer against Fontainebleau Terrace Owners Association, Inc. The complaint alleges that on April 2, 2019, the defendant had the responsibility to inspect and maintain the common area property located at 14401 F...
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 28, 2019EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 28, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- FONTAINEBLEAU TERRACE OWNERS ASSOCIATION
Date: August 28, 2019EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 09/05/2019 FONTAINEBLEAU TERRACE OWNERS ASSC INC.
Date: September 10, 2019EP - MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED - FONTAINEBLEAU TERRACE OWNERS ASSOC INC.
Date: January 13, 2020EP - ORDER GRANTING DFTS AMENDED MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT
Date: November 12, 2020EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- FOUNTAINBLEAU TERRACE OWNERS ASSOC INC
Date: November 13, 2020EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 30, 2020EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 01, 2021EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 01, 2021EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 02, 2021EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES- FOUNTAINBLEAU TERRACE OWNERS ASSOC INC | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER GRANTING DFTS AMENDED MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 11/10/2020 AT 2:30 PM IN JC/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING- 11/10/20 AT 2:30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.